Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Xavier Rajaonarivo

Deceased

Bishop of Miarinarivo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1915BornFenomanana
26 Jul 194530.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 196045.0AppointedBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar
8 May 196045.1Ordained BishopBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar
15 Nov 198570.6DiedBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for François Xavier Rajaonarivo:
Bishop François Xavier Rajaonarivo (born , died ) Bishop of Miarinarivo

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013