Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Mosconi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Iraq

Titular Archbishop of Leges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1914Born
2 Apr 193823.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 196753.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leges
9 Nov 196753.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Madagascar
10 Dec 196753.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Leges
196954.3AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Apr 197055.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iraq
May 197156.6ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iraq
14 Dec 198167.2DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Iraq

MicroData Summary for Paolo Mosconi
Archbishop Paolo Mosconi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Iraq

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Giuletta

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast