Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Piat, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of Port-Louis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1941 BornMoka
2 Aug 197029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Jan 199149.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
19 May 199149.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
15 Feb 199351.6SucceededBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius

MicroData Summary for Maurice Piat:
Bishop Maurice Piat C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of Port-Louis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port-Louis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,405
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013