Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Xavier-Marie Baronnet, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port Victoria o Seychelles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1927BornChantenay, France
7 Sep 196033.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Mar 199567.9AppointedBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
25 Jun 199568.2Ordained BishopBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
1 Jun 200275.2RetiredBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
8 Sep 201285.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Port Victoria o Seychelles

MicroData Summary for Xavier-Marie Baronnet:
Bishop Xavier-Marie Baronnet S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port Victoria o Seychelles

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,569
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013