Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie Fabien Raharilamboniaina, O.C.D.

Bishop of Morondava, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1968 Born
8 Sep 199022.6ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
5 Jul 199729.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
26 Feb 201042.0AppointedBishop of Morondava, Madagascar
16 May 201042.3Ordained BishopBishop of Morondava, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Marie Fabien Raharilamboniaina
Bishop Marie Fabien Raharilamboniaina O.C.D. (born ) Bishop of Morondava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmbohijanahary

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Morondava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017