Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Symphorian Thomas Keeprath, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jullundur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1931BornKoodalloor
22 Mar 195826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Dec 197140.6AppointedBishop of Jullundur, India
18 Mar 197240.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jullundur, India
24 Feb 200775.8RetiredBishop of Jullundur, India
3 May 201584.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jullundur, India

MicroData Summary for Symphorian Thomas Keeprath:
Bishop Symphorian Thomas Keeprath O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jullundur

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2007
  • d: CB, 3 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 28 May 2015