Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Celestine Elampassery, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jammu-Srinagar, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1938Born
3 Oct 196628.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Apr 199859.7AppointedBishop of Jammu-Srinagar, India
6 Sep 199860.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jammu-Srinagar, India
3 Dec 201476.4RetiredBishop of Jammu-Srinagar, India
27 May 201576.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Jammu-Srinagar, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Celestine Elampassery
Bishop Peter Celestine Elampassery O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jammu-Srinagar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuttuchira

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,377
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2014
  • d: CB, 27 May 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast