Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hippolytus Anthony Kunnunkal, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jammu-Srinagar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1921BornAllapuaha
11 Apr 195130.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Nov 197857.7AppointedPrefect of Jammu and Kashmir, India
10 Mar 198665.0AppointedBishop of Jammu-Srinagar, India
29 Jun 198665.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jammu-Srinagar, India
3 Apr 199877.1RetiredBishop of Jammu-Srinagar, India
9 Aug 200887.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Jammu-Srinagar, India

MicroData Summary for Hippolytus Anthony Kunnunkal:
Bishop Hippolytus Anthony Kunnunkal O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jammu-Srinagar

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013