Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oswald Lewis

Bishop of Jaipur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1944 Born
30 Dec 197228.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 199753.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meerut, India
16 Apr 199853.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Meerut, India
20 Jul 200560.9AppointedBishop of Jaipur, India

MicroData Summary for Oswald Lewis
Bishop Oswald Lewis (born ) Bishop of Jaipur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKemmannu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jaipur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018