Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andjelik Juraj Bedenik, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Agra, India

Titular Bishop of Leuce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1808Born
1 Jun 186153.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Agra, India
18 Jun 186153.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
21 Jul 186153.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
2 Nov 186658.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Agra, India

MicroData Summary for Andjelik Juraj Bedenik (VIAF: 305509725)
Bishop Andjelik Juraj Bedenik O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Agra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoprivnica
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 341
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Jan 2017