Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Cantimorri, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Parma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1811BornRussi
31 Dec 183322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Dec 184635.9AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
27 Dec 184635.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
23 Jun 185443.4AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
28 Jul 187059.5DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Cantimorri:
Bishop Felice Cantimorri O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Parma

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 139, and Page 442

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013