Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Pezzoni, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tibet-Hindustan

Titular Bishop of Esbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1777BornLodi, Italy
27 Jan 182648.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan, India
27 Jan 182648.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Esbus
12 Feb 182648.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Esbus
1842¹64.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan, India
4 Oct 184466.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tibet-Hindustan, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonino Pezzoni
Bishop Antonino Pezzoni O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tibet-Hindustan

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016