Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Caesar Scotti, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sardhana

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Sep 1834AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sardhana, India
9 Sep 1834AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
12 Jul 1835Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
19 Jun 1836ResignedVicar Apostolic of Sardhana, India
8 Aug 1862DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sardhana, India

MicroData Summary for Julius Caesar Scotti
Bishop Julius Caesar Scotti O.F.M. Cap. (died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sardhana

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016