Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Angelus Jacobi (Jacopi), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Agra, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1812Born
5 Feb 183724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Mar 186855.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Agra, India
3 Mar 186855.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
28 Jun 186855.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
25 Nov 188673.9AppointedArchbishop of Agra, India
14 Oct 189178.8DiedArchbishop of Agra, India

MicroData Summary for Michael Angelus Jacobi (Jacopi)
Archbishop Michael Angelus Jacobi (Jacopi) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Agra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeravezza
Ordained BishopCalcutta

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 82, and Page 446
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017