Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Symphorien Charles-Jacques Mouard (Monard), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lahore, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1828Born
1851¹22.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 May 185526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Aug 188253.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Seychelles
8 Aug 188253.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
29 Oct 188253.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
10 Aug 188859.7AppointedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
14 Jul 189061.6DiedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Symphorien Charles-Jacques Mouard (Monard)
Bishop Symphorien Charles-Jacques Mouard (Monard) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Lahore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSombernon, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Agra, Vicariate Apostolic of Agra, India

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 81, and Page 330
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast