Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Vincenzo Pesci, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Allahabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1833Born
11 Apr 185723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 May 188147.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Patna, India
8 May 188147.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Marciana
14 Aug 188147.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marciana
25 Nov 188653.2AppointedBishop of Allahabad, India
8 Jul 189662.8DiedBishop of Allahabad, India

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vincenzo Pesci (VIAF: 307357968)
Bishop Francesco Vincenzo Pesci O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Allahabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Allahabad, Diocese of Allahabad

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 90, and Page 365
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017