Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Beiderlinden, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Poona, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1842Born
23 Apr 186522.6EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
22 Dec 188644.3AppointedBishop of Poona, India
27 Feb 188744.5Ordained BishopBishop of Poona, India
7 May 190764.7DiedBishop of Poona, India

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Beiderlinden
Bishop Bernhard Beiderlinden S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Poona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünster, Diocese of Münster, Germany
Ordained BishopAllahabad, Diocese of Allahabad

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 462
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017