Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Cardinal Aiuti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1849Born
22 Sep 187122.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 188737.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
31 Mar 188737.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to India
1 May 188737.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
24 Jul 189142.1AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
16 May 189343.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
12 Jun 189343.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
15 Jul 189647.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
22 Jun 190354.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 190354.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
12 Nov 190354.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
28 Apr 190555.8DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Andrea Aiuti (VIAF: 54895899)
Andrea Cardinal Aiuti (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bombay, Archdiocese of Bombay, India
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1903
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 23
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 57, and Page 215, and Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast