Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolphus Edwin Medlycott

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese)

Titular Bishop of Tricomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1838BornChittagong
17 Mar 186122.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 188749.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese), India
13 Sep 188749.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
11 Dec 188749.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
18 Dec 188749.6InstalledVicar Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese), India
189657.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese), India
4 May 191880.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Adolphus Edwin Medlycott:
Bishop Adolphus Edwin Medlycott (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Trichur

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,549
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 565
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013