Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Toti

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1834BornSiena
19 Sep 185723.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189157.5AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
20 Dec 189157.5Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
12 Mar 190368.7DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Toti:
Bishop Alessandro Toti (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013