Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emmanuel Alfonso van den Bosch, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Agra, India

Titular Archbishop of Parium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1854Born
1879¹24.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Nov 189036.4AppointedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
18 Jan 189136.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
2 May 189237.8AppointedArchbishop of Agra, India
5 May 189742.8ResignedArchbishop of Agra, India
5 May 189742.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Parium
15 Oct 192167.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Agra, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Alfonso van den Bosch
Archbishop Emmanuel Alfonso van den Bosch O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Agra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnvers, Belgium
Ordained BishopPro-Cathderal, Lahore, Diocese of Lahore, Pakistan

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 82, and Page 330
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 441
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017