Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marek Grzegorz Marczak

Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland

Titular Bishop of Leontium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1969 Born
11 Jun 199425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Łódź, Poland
28 Feb 201546.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland
28 Feb 201546.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Leontium
11 Apr 201546.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leontium
30 Jan 201747.9AppointedAdministrator of Łódź, Poland
4 Nov 201748.7CeasedAdministrator of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marek Grzegorz Marczak
Bishop Marek Grzegorz Marczak (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiotrków Trybunalski, Archdiocese of Łódź
Ordained PriestSt. Stanislaus Kostka, Cathedral Basilica, Łódź, Archdiocese of Łódź
Ordained BishopSt. Stanislaus Kostka, Cathedral Basilica, Łódź, Archdiocese of Łódź

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Łódź.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 28 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 7 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,470

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast