Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bogdan Marian Wincenty Sikorski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1920Born
8 Apr 194525.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 196443.8AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
5 Apr 196444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
4 Feb 198867.8DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Bogdan Marian Wincenty Sikorski
Bishop Bogdan Marian Wincenty Sikorski (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoznan

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018