Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Wosinski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Płock

Titular Bishop of Abaradira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1914BornNiedospielin
18 Jun 193925.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 196147.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Płock, Poland
20 Nov 196147.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Abaradira
4 Feb 196247.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abaradira
21 Jan 196449.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
19 Oct 199177.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
19 Jul 199682.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Wosinski:
Bishop Jan Wosinski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Płock

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013