Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Paweł Zakrzewski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1883Born
11 Feb 190622.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 193854.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland
8 Aug 193854.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cariana
22 Sep 193855.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cariana
12 Apr 194662.6AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
26 Nov 196178.2DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Paweł Zakrzewski (VIAF: 166225831)
Bishop Tadeusz Paweł Zakrzewski (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSkoki

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018