Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Cieński

Deceased

Bishop


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1905BornPieniaki, Ukraine
26 Jun 193833.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
30 Jun 196762.4Ordained BishopBishop
26 Dec 199287.9DiedBishop

MicroData Summary for Jan Cieński
Bishop Jan Cieński (born , died ) Bishop

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,420
  • opd: CB, 11 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 12 Feb 2016