Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adrian Józef Galbas, S.A.C.

Archbishop of Katowice, Poland

Apostolic Administrator of Sosnowiec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1968 Born
29 Sep 198921.6First VowsMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
10 Sep 199325.6Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
7 May 199426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
12 Dec 201951.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ełk, Poland
12 Dec 201951.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Naissus
11 Jan 202051.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naissus
4 Dec 202153.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Katowice, Poland
15 Dec 202153.8InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Katowice, Poland
31 May 202355.3SucceededArchbishop of Katowice, Poland
24 Oct 202355.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sosnowiec, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adrian Józef Galbas
(VIAF: 306403745; WikiData: Q78193371)
Archbishop Adrian Józef Galbas S.A.C. (born ) Archbishop of Katowice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBytom, Archdiocese of Katowice
Ordained PriestOur Lady Queen of Apostles, Church, Ożarow Mazowiecki, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Ordained BishopSt. Wojciech, Cathedral, Ełk, Diocese of Ełk

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Katowice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2019
  • ob: CB, 15 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Number 20,338
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2021
  • s: Bollettino, 31 May 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 28 Oct 2023