Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Bukovsky, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Russian Federation

Titular Archbishop of Tabalta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1924Born
3 Dec 195026.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
18 Aug 199066.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tabalta
18 Aug 199066.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Romania
13 Oct 199066.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tabalta
20 Dec 199470.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Russian Federation
29 Jan 200076.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Russian Federation
18 Dec 201086.9DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Russian Federation

MicroData Summary for John Bukovsky
Archbishop John Bukovsky S.V.D. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Russian Federation

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerova, Slovakia

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,191
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018