Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Pacyfik Dydycz, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Drohiczyn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1938 BornSerpelice
29 Jun 196324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Jun 199455.8AppointedBishop of Drohiczyn, Poland
10 Jul 199455.9Ordained BishopBishop of Drohiczyn, Poland
29 Mar 201475.6RetiredBishop of Drohiczyn, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Pacyfik Dydycz:
Bishop Antoni Pacyfik Dydycz O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Drohiczyn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Drohiczyn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,352
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 29 Mar 2014