Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Waclaw Skomorucha

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Siedlce

Titular Bishop of Zoara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1915BornSterdyn
8 Sep 194025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Siedlce, Poland
21 Nov 196247.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland
21 Nov 196247.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zoara
21 Apr 196348.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zoara
1 Feb 199276.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland
25 Aug 200186.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Siedlce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Waclaw Skomorucha:
Bishop Waclaw Skomorucha (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Siedlce

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,820
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015