Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Ozorowski

Archbishop Emeritus of Białystok, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1941 Born
21 Jun 196423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Białystok, Poland
31 Jan 197937.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
31 Jan 197937.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bitettum
29 Apr 197937.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bitettum
5 Jun 199150.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Białystok, Poland
21 Oct 200665.4AppointedArchbishop of Białystok, Poland
16 Nov 200665.5InstalledArchbishop of Białystok, Poland
12 Apr 201775.9RetiredArchbishop of Białystok, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edward Ozorowski (VIAF: 89619661)
Archbishop Edward Ozorowski (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Białystok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWólka Przedmiescie

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Białystok.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017