Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev

Archidioecesis Minscensis Latinorum-Mohiloviensis Latinorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Tadeusz Kondrusiewicz, Archbishop
  • Yury Kasabutski, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 13 April 1991
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Belarus
  • Square Kilometers: 69,800 (26,960 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: pl. Swobody 9, 220030 Minsk, Belarus
  • Telephone: (17)223.65.41
  • Fax: 226.90.92

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Minsk
9 August 1798ErectedDiocese of Minsk (erected)
Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev
13 April 1991UnitedDiocese of Minsk
Archdiocese of Mohilev
Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev
13 October 1999Territory LostArchdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev Diocese of Vitebsk (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Minsk
1990250,00010,000,0002.5%5012624,03212162ap1991
Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev
1999350,0006,200,0005.6%3934734,7945490132ap2000
2000210,0004,800,0004.4%2823514,117425279ap2001
2001210,0004,800,0004.4%3127583,620416879ap2002
2002210,0004,800,0004.4%3125563,750355484ap2003
2003210,0004,800,0004.4%3234663,181446084ap2004
2004210,0004,800,0004.4%3531663,181436589ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Sep 2014