Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Chrzciciel Louis Masclet, O.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Minsk

Titular Bishop of Camachus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1762BornDouai, France
24 Mar 178724.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Minims
22 Dec 178725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
26 Sep 181452.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Minsk, Belarus
26 Sep 181452.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
6 Jul 181754.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
11 Jul 183673.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Minsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Jan Chrzciciel Louis Masclet:
Bishop Jan Chrzciciel Louis Masclet O.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Minsk

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Sep 2014