Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Nepomucen Kossakowski

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1775BornSlaven
26 Mar 178711.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 179318.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
23 Sep 179318.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
2 Feb 179418.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
10 May 179418.9SucceededBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
17 Nov 179823.4AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
8 Oct 180833.3DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Jan Nepomucen Kossakowski:
Bishop Jan Nepomucen Kossakowski (born , died ) Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 442
  • ob/c2?: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013