Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Kazimierz Kossakowski

Deceased

Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

Coadjutor Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1738BornVilnius
17 Apr 176325.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 177536.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
13 Mar 177536.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cinna
30 Apr 177537.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cinna
17 Sep 178143.5AppointedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
19 Dec 179153.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
9 May 179456.1DiedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Kazimierz Kossakowski
Bishop Józef Kazimierz Kossakowski (born , died ) Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 435
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016