Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Bykowski, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1748BornWielisz
2 Jun 177021.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Jun 177223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Jul 178637.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
5 Nov 178638.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Bykowski:
Bishop Mikołaj Bykowski O.P. (born ) Titular Bishop of Troas

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 418
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,908
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016