Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Jakub Massalski

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1727BornOlekszczyce
13 Feb 176234.5SelectedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
29 Mar 176234.6ConfirmedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
2 May 176234.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
28 Jun 179466.9DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Jakub Massalski:
Bishop Ignacy Jakub Massalski (born , died ) Bishop of Vilnius

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,882
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 442

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015