Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Korwin Kossakowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

Titular Bishop of Limyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1756BornLemmicuwicz
1 Jun 179538.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
1 Jun 179538.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
Aug 1798³41.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limyra
4 May 182871.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Korwin Kossakowski
Bishop Adam Korwin Kossakowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 262
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016