Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Kundzicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Anastasiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1747³BornKrznsew
6 Aug 177224.8ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
7 Nov 177326.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
8 Dec 177326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Jul 181567.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
10 Jul 181567.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
10 May 181769.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
15 Jan 182981.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Kundzicz:
Bishop Tadeusz Kundzicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 73
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,033

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013