Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateusz Lipski, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Minsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1770³BornDzisna
27 Feb 179928.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
6 Mar 179928.4Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
16 Aug 181241.9IncardinatedPriest of Mohilev, Belarus
24 Nov 182353.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
24 Nov 182353.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
5 Sep 182453.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
14 Mar 182958.4SelectedBishop of Minsk, Belarus
28 Feb 183160.4ConfirmedBishop of Minsk, Belarus
21 Nov 183969.1DiedBishop of Minsk, Belarus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mateusz Lipski
Bishop Mateusz Lipski O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Minsk

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 97, and Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016