Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Giedrojć

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

Titular Bishop of Casius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1771³BornJaniszki
24 Aug 179322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jan 179523.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 182452.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
24 May 182452.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Casius
31 Dec 182655.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casius
15 Feb 182957.4DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Giedrojć
Bishop Ignacy Giedrojć (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,193
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 138, and Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Jun 2016