Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikodem Puzyna

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Satala in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1753³BornPompiany
26 Nov 177522.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jan 177622.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 181461.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
26 Sep 181461.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
3 May 181763.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
22 Oct 181966.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikodem Puzyna:
Bishop Nikodem Puzyna (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 336
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,031

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013