Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yury Kasabutski

Auxiliary Bishop of Minsk-Mohilev

Titular Bishop of Scilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1970 BornMaladechna
7 Dec 199626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
29 Nov 201343.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
29 Nov 201343.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
25 Jan 201443.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scilium

MicroData Summary for Yury Kasabutski:
Bishop Yury Kasabutski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Minsk-Mohilev

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 29 Nov 2013
  • c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,078

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015