Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Baraka

Deceased

Bishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1888Born
25 Jun 191123.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 193850.1AppointedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
16 Oct 193850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
9 Dec 194658.5DiedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Georges Baraka
Bishop Georges Baraka (born , died ) Bishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTahtah

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1947
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast