Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucien Fruchaud

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1934 Born
14 Jan 196227.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nantes, France
30 Jun 196227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
17 Jul 199257.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
19 Sep 199257.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
20 Aug 201075.8RetiredBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France

MicroData Summary for Lucien Fruchaud (VIAF: 208272029)
Bishop Lucien Fruchaud (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Loroux-Bottereau
Ordained DeaconGrand Séminaire, Chapel, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained PriestSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Aug 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,793
  • od/c01: AJ, 30 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast