Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Marie-Joseph Pinson

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1885BornBourges
8 Oct 191125.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 194357.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
18 Mar 194357.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
18 Apr 195165.4DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie-Joseph Pinson:
Bishop Henri-Marie-Joseph Pinson (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015