Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Justin-Michel Girbeau

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1870BornBaixas
12 Jun 189424.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 192454.7AppointedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
16 Dec 192454.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
12 Jan 192554.9InstalledBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
10 Oct 196090.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
20 Jun 196393.3DiedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Justin-Michel Girbeau:
Archbishop Jean-Justin-Michel Girbeau (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

  • a priest for 69.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013