Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Eugène-Alexandre Marty

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1850Born
30 May 187423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
7 Aug 190756.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montauban, France
7 Aug 190756.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Acmonia
21 Sep 190756.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acmonia
10 Jan 190857.1SucceededBishop of Montauban, France
3 Feb 192978.2DiedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Eugène-Alexandre Marty
Bishop Pierre-Eugène-Alexandre Marty (born , died ) Bishop of Montauban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeaumont-du-Périgord

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 35
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017