Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Louis-Marie Cortet

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1817Born
11 Oct 184023.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 187558.4SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
23 Sep 187558.5ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
30 Nov 187558.7Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
15 Feb 189880.9DiedBishop of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Louis-Marie Cortet (VIAF: 88751656)
Bishop Pierre-Louis-Marie Cortet (born , died ) Bishop of Troyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChatêau-Chinon
Ordained BishopParay le Monial, Basilica, Paray le Monial

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 563
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017