Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Michiel Jozef Antoon Hanssen

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1906Born
5 Apr 193023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
26 Jul 194740.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
26 Jul 194740.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
7 Oct 194741.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
31 Dec 195751.3SucceededBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
25 Jun 195851.8DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Jan Michiel Jozef Antoon Hanssen
Bishop Jan Michiel Jozef Antoon Hanssen (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOostrum-Venray

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018